U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00035-2
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arrest ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 15, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 10, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 10, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.