U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00006-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Michael
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arrest ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.