U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COVINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.