U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.