U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Early
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.