U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandefur
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.