U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [SEALED Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.