U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Broadway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.