U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.