U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buchanan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.