U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 31, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.