U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Contreras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.