U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arrest ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.