U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 03, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arrest]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.