U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DONEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.