U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEJIA BONILLA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 23, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.