U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carthran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Inquiry of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.