U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valdez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • May 01, 2025: [Case Number - USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.