U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.