U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.