U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.