U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindsey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 14, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 11, 2025: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.