U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. London
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 09, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.