U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escorcia-Olin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 03, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 03, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.