U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00265-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.