U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.