U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. England
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 04, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.