U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riddick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Order]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 09, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.