U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.