U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salinas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.