U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.