U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.