U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00731
  • Case Name: Griffin v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Amicus Curiae Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response (non motion)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Create Case Association]
  • April 14, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.