U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00069
  • Case Name: PERFORMANCE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. v. Falls Lake National Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.