U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00700
  • Case Name: RAMOS v. FLINT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Working Copies Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Mediator]
  • April 24, 2025: [Mediation Scheduling Order ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Referred to Mediation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 26f - Joint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Rule 26f Report - Joint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.