U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00283
  • Case Name: DAVIS v. PIEDMONT HEALTH SERVICES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response - non motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Substitute]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Right to Consent]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Petition for Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.