U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Hayward Industries, Inc. v. Azevedo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.