U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00323
  • Case Name: RUMLEY v. CITY OF GRAHAM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Working Copies Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Mediator]
  • May 02, 2025: [Mediation Scheduling Order ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Rule 26f - Joint]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 26f Report - Joint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.