U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Stanton v. Marken, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.