U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ponce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.