U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anthony
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.