U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nicholes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.