U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LYNCH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 29, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.