U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.