U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Small
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.