U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Corrales Arrieta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.