U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00327-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONNALLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 29, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.