U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00644
  • Case Name: Maynard et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Selected for Mediation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.