U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez Pineda
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.