U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Rhodes v. Navy Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Remand]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Self-Representation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.